Financial history VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 302889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £11.15k £16.01k £19.20k £4.47k £8.68k
Total expenditure £13.72k £12.50k £6.00k £7.95k £8.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £18.31k N/A N/A