Financial history CLAPTON AND HACKNEY UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity Number: 303015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024 01/04/2025
Total gross income £16.04k £5.75k £4.38k £4.00k £4.72k
Total expenditure £7.05k £6.53k £9.61k £7.16k £7.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A