Accounts and annual returns THE INSTITUTION OF WORKS AND HIGHWAYS MANAGMENT (BERNARD BUTLER) TRUST

Charity Number: 1063735
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 September 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 January 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required