Accounts and annual returns THE KARTEN ALPHA CTEC TRUST

Charity number: 1061371
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 17 April 2007 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 12 April 2007 71 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 23 March 2006 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time