Accounts and annual returns WALPOLE HIGHWAY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304101
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 30 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 11 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 24 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 07 December 2020 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required