Accounts and annual returns DAVENTRY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 304180
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2016 12 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 June 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2015 19 September 2016 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 September 2016 81 days late
Annual return 31 August 2014 25 March 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 25 March 2015 On Time