Trustees STANTON HARCOURT MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 304373

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE EAGLE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Susan Janet Mols | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Morley | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Vivien Tomlinson | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sue Pryse | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH ANNE PARKER | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARGARET SELLARS | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARY GILGRASS | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER LINDA BEILBY | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA SENSECALL | Trustee | 06 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Marie Heath | Trustee | 14 May 2009 |
|
|
||||
ALISON JANE HILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAY ELIZABETH POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.