Financial history WITNEY BUTTERCROSS SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 304425
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £162.40k £61.98k £41.74k £71.34k £301.02k
Total expenditure £144.97k £44.24k £51.50k £82.41k £114.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £30.68k N/A N/A £2.54k