Accounts and annual returns ERRINGTON PARK

Charity Number: 304459
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 11 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required