Financial history Butcombe Village Hall

Charity number: 304503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.99k £19.68k £14.78k £3.70k £2.62k
Total expenditure £2.22k £6.99k £4.51k £5.70k £4.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.43k £10.67k N/A N/A