Financial history FIVEHEAD PLAYING FIELD

Charity Number: 304544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.79k £3.25k £3.92k £4.91k £5.76k
Total expenditure £8.63k £5.99k £5.28k £4.78k £4.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A