Accounts and annual returns CORTON PLAYING FIELD

Charity Number: 304733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 May 2024 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 06 March 2024 35 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 February 2021 19 days late Download Open in new window