Accounts and annual returns KING GEORGE'S FIELD, HAUGHLEY

Charity number: 304761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 08 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 08 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 May 2024 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 May 2024 120 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 February 2022 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 February 2022 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required