Accounts and annual returns RUSHMERE, ST ANDREW VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304812
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 08 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 13 November 2007 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 13 November 2007 13 days late
Annual return 31 December 2005 25 April 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 25 April 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 29 April 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 29 April 2005 On Time