Financial history BOXFORD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £20.67k £25.29k £18.53k £25.34k £21.48k
Total expenditure £14.78k £16.74k £21.58k £22.16k £18.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £18.71k £5.37k £2.90k N/A