Accounts and annual returns GALLETTS AND POLEBRIDGE RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 304923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 May 2023 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 May 2023 485 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 May 2023 850 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required