Financial history STOKE-BY-NAYLAND VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 304943
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.37k £3.36k £4.68k £29.95k £6.21k
Total expenditure £4.19k £4.03k £2.37k £3.99k £4.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.67k N/A