Trustees THE WICKHAMBROOK MEMORIAL SOCIAL CENTRE
Charity Number: 304956

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVEN PHILLIP THWAITE | Chair | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH MAYES | Trustee | 02 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Harrison | Trustee | 08 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Harding | Trustee | 08 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA WOOD | Trustee | 19 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA MERRITT | Trustee | 21 April 2010 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.