Financial history CHOBHAM RECREATION GROUND CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 305004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £48.10k £37.91k £44.74k £43.70k £50.66k
Total expenditure £48.10k £37.91k £44.74k £43.70k £40.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £22.26k N/A £29.23k £21.06k £27.56k