Financial history THE HALE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 305035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £10.13k £4.66k £18.17k £21.22k £20.54k
Total expenditure £13.63k £9.36k £29.82k £41.46k £13.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £2.67k N/A N/A