Financial history HINDHEAD PLAYING FIELD ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 305064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £17.97k £24.94k £15.64k £18.71k £39.41k
Total expenditure £6.39k £21.60k £9.98k £8.16k £47.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £9.91k £5.00k £6.66k N/A