Governing document SHALFORD VILLAGE HALL (SURREY)
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13 NOV 1962, AS AMENDED BY ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS 25 OCT 2002, RESOLUTIONS OF THE TRUSTEES DATED 11 NOVEMBER 2002 , 12 JAN 2004 AND ORDER DATED 20 APRIL 2004.
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF SHALFORD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SHALFORD AND NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.