Trustees SUNBURY AND WALTON UNIT 327 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
Charity number: 305130
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gail Heather Cramp | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Matthew Goldhawk | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Anthony Perrings Walsh | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Ball | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Skelley | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jane Norcross | Trustee | 28 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Derek Michael Lloyd | Trustee | 25 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ann Reid | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLENIS TELLETT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.