Trustees KING EDWARD VII INSTITUTE
Charity number: 305234
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Arnold Howell | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Lewis Thirkell | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Josephine Allan | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Ellen Phillips | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN CHURCHILL HOMEWOOD | Trustee | 12 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
TONY BOSSONS ACA | Trustee | 07 November 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.