Financial history THE ASCENSION PRE-SCHOOL PLAY GROUP

Charity number: 305249
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013
Total gross income £31.85k £43.48k £65.60k £62.12k £57.06k
Total expenditure £35.93k £49.42k £60.34k £47.24k £52.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A