Financial history ALDERBURY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305458
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.39k £10.34k £11.92k £33.71k £27.62k
Total expenditure £7.94k £6.15k £24.10k £24.61k £28.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A