Financial history CHITTERNE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £5.31k £2.36k £3.31k £9.06k £17.36k
Total expenditure £9.20k £2.37k £8.71k £8.11k £12.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A