Financial history ENFORD RECREATION GROUND AND VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305512
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £20.06k £21.91k £13.77k £15.24k £14.83k
Total expenditure £11.26k £14.42k £8.62k £14.41k £10.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.80k £19.56k £2.67k N/A N/A