Financial history WILCOT RECREATION GROUND AND VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 305596
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £3.63k £17.54k £2.18k £3.21k £4.41k
Total expenditure £5.23k £5.66k £9.00k £9.57k £4.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.50k N/A N/A N/A