Trustees HEMINGFORD ABBOTS VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1078838

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Stuart Prosser | Chair | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan Tuohy | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catheryn Ann Reed | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Denney | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rie Hargreaves | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Nicol | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Lager | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Cloke | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.