Accounts and annual returns BLACKDOWN OR SMITH'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 306198
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 30 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 08 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 11 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 25 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 09 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required