Financial history WENTWORTH MILTON MOUNT LIMITED

Charity number: 306322
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011
Total gross income £2.41m £2.17m £592.14k £0 £0
Total expenditure £2.57m £2.42m £4.61m £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £13.69k £410.11k £5.00k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £144.75k £52.56k £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £2.02m £1.71m £587.06k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £8.03k £1.66k £72 N/A N/A
Income - Other £1.07k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.17m £2.41m £4.60m N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £174.46k £6.37k £8.55k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A