Governing document THE LADY VERNON (NEWICK) EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE HIGH COURT OF JUSTICE (CHANCERY DIVISION OF 28 JULY 1926 AS AFFECTED BY A SCHEME OF THE MINISTER OF EDUCATION OF 19 AUGUST 1955. SCHEME OF 29 OCTOBER 1979). SCHEME OF COMMISSION OF 6 SEPTEMBER 1995 AND RESOLUTION DATED 10 NOVEMBER 2008.
Charitable objects
PROVISIONS OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ANY PERSON OF EITHER SEX OR TO ANY ORGANISATION COMPRISING PEOPLE OF ONE OR BOTH SEXES FOR THE PURPOSES OF HIGHER EDUCATION OR OTHERWISE FOR THEIR ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.