Trustees DAME BARBARA THOMAS AND SYBILLA STAPELEY'S FOUNDATION

Charity number: 306453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hazel Hobbs Trustee 09 November 2024
HENRIETTA HAY CHARITY
Received: On time
Angela Glaysher Trustee 12 February 2015
None on record
Gordon Fowlie Trustee 19 March 2014
None on record
JENNIFER MARY HILL Trustee 24 October 2011
HENRIETTA HAY CHARITY
Received: On time
VERONICA HUMPHREY Trustee 12 October 2010
HENRIETTA HAY CHARITY
Received: On time