Accounts and annual returns GRENVILLE HOUSE - OUTDOOR EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity number: 306947
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 21 August 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 25 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 25 July 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 18 July 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 18 July 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 23 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 23 August 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 27 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 27 September 2005 On Time