Financial history SCHOOL INCLUDING GIFTS OF LOVE AND BECKFORD

Charity number: 307200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.29k £1.32k £1.35k £1.38k £1.42k
Total expenditure £1.01k £1.14k £315 £1.71k £560
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A