Accounts and annual returns HADDENHAM COMMUNITY INFANT SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1097357
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 April 2024 09 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 07 April 2023 01 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 07 April 2022 19 March 2023 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 07 April 2021 18 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 07 April 2020 27 March 2021 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2020 Not Required