Financial history STELLA TAYLOR YOUNG CHRISTIAN MUSICIANS TRUST

Charity number: 1062828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £609 £507 £533 £564 £560
Total expenditure £420 £408 £372 £591 £984
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A