Trustees CRAWLEY YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity number: 1063751

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hayley Thomas | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Subodh Dharni | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ishwer Narayanan | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Marie Shaw | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
LAURA JEAN MOFFATT | Trustee | 22 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR ANEAL SHARMA | Trustee | 15 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Michael James | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
KIRPAL PANESAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY ELIZABETH MAYNE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.