Accounts and annual returns STOPSLEY HIGH SCHOOL FUND

Charity Number: 307509
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2006 28 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2005 14 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 19 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2004 20 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 Not Required