Trustees IFIC LIMITED

Charity number: 1072681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Carol Margaret Mclay Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Dr Andrea Johanna Grisold Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Dr Raman Sardana Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Dr Ramona Marincas Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Dr Barbara Catt Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Dr Gehan Fahmy Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Jacob Gobte Nkwan Nurse Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Dr Karin Ingrid Birgitta Lytsy Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Dr Marilyn Cruickshank Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record