Accounts and annual returns FLIGHT LIEUTENANT PETER ANTHONY MAJOR PRIZE

Charity number: 307717
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 30 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 30 June 2008 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 04 April 2007 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not submitted