Accounts and annual returns THE METROPOLE ARTS CENTRE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 307759
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2011 23 November 2012 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not Required