Accounts and annual returns AFRO CARE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1069098
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 July 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 July 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 29 July 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 July 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 29 July 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 July 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 29 July 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 July 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 29 July 2004 06 April 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 July 2004 Not Required