Financial history THE TUNBRIDGE WELLS GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR GIRLS PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 307812
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £49.24k £25.64k £19.30k £22.91k £40.87k
Total expenditure £68.77k £5.99k £37.24k £10.45k £53.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A