Accounts and annual returns ASHVILLE MUSLIM WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1062123
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 06 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 08 July 2024 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 27 January 2025 302 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 27 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 27 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 13 April 2022 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 01 April 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 13 April 2022 378 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 01 April 2022 366 days late Download Open in new window