Financial history CHARITIES ADMINISTERED I C W FOLKESTONE GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR GIRLS

Charity Number: 307861
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.02k £2.05k £2.08k £2.14k £2.19k
Total expenditure £1.35k £1.35k £1.53k £1.56k £1.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A