Governing document CANTERBURY CHRIST CHURCH UNIVERSITY COLLEGE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5/4/1961, REVISED 9/7/1968, SUPPLEMENTAL TRUST DEEDS DATED 31/5/1979 AND 31/5/1991, INSTRUMENT AND ARTICLES OF GOVERNMENT DATED 24/5/1991, REVISED 30/9/2000, AND ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 30/6/2003.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, LEARNING AND RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR, AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, THE CONDUCT AND DEVELOPMENT OF A COLLEGE TO BE CALLED CANTERBURY CHRIST CHURCH COLLEGE, FOR THE TRAINING OF PERSONS AS TEACHERS AND THE PROVISION OF OTHER HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.