Accounts and annual returns HOW TO MAKE THE WORLD A BETTER PLACE
Charity number: 1062228
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2010 | 14 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2009 | 18 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2008 | 06 January 2009 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2008 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window