Financial history CHARITY OF FRANCES JANE WARD THE PUBLIC LIBRARY

Charity number: 309950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.72k £10.07k £9.49k £8.68k £7.98k
Total expenditure £15.73k £10.25k £7.40k £6.38k £17.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A